CO HB1150 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 15 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the Colorado office of new Americans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create The Colorado Office Of New Americans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1150 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1150 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-19SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-05-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-08HouseHouse Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Finance
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1150
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1150_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1150_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1150_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1150_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1150_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1150_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1150_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1150_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1150_L.004.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1150_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1150_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1150_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1150_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/46bcc200682565e6872586b1005be586-hb21-1150-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b7b7641b269f370e872586b80062f31b-hb21-1150-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/46bcc200682565e6872586b1005be586-hb21-1150-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/75ef1c70ddbc0a5b872586cb004e3486-hb21-1150-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1150vote6ca652
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1150vote545fbc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ae405aeafbd4f62b872586da0080afa1-hb21-1150-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b7b7641b269f370e872586b80062f31b-hb21-1150-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dc6b24f64c39b690872586e10053b50e-hb21-1150-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1150vote5a2b89

Bill Comments 750

feedback