CO HB1150 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sev Tax Op Fund Transfers For Mine Reclamation
Title
Sev Tax Op Fund Transfers For Mine Reclamation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1150 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1150 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1150 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-03-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-20 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations |