CO HB1147 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning revisions to the traumatic brain injury program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Revise Traumatic Brain Injury Program
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Larry Crowder [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1147 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1147 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1147 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1147 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1147, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1147, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1147 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1147 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1147 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1147 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1147, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1147, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |