CO HB1146 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the practice of auricular acudetox by a professional, and, in connection therewith, clarifying that in order to perform auricular acudetox, a person does not need to be licensed, certified, or registered as a mental health professional.
Title
Auricular Acudetox Professional Practice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1146 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1146 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1146 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1146 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |