CO HB1146 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State-funded Public Assistance Programs
Title
State-funded Public Assistance Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1146 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1146, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1146 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1146, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-23 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations | |
2010-04-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-20 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-16 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-01 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations |