CO HB1145 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Availability Background Check Child Care
Title
Availability Background Check Child Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-04-26 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-21 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-15 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-25 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations | |
2011-03-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-21 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-02-09 | House Committee on Education Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |