CO HB1144 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning amendments to the automatic cash fund funding mechanism for payment of future costs attributable to certain of the state's capital assets.
Title
Amend Capitol Construction Automatic Funding Mechanism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1144 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1144 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1144 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1144 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-01 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |