CO HB1144 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorders
Title
Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1144 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1144 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1144 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1144 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1144 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1144, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-23 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-22 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-21 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-16 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment |