CO HB1140 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the elimination of costs associated with living organ donation for a living organ donor, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate Donor Costs For Living Organ Donations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1140 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1140 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1140, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1140, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1140, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1140, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-20SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2021-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-24HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1140
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1140_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1140_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1140_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1140_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1140_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1140_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1140_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1140_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1140_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1140_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/923183a7731fa595872586a2006c9e79-hb21-1140-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/923183a7731fa595872586a2006c9e79-hb21-1140-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f62ef6cde7c5954a872586c0004f2737-hb21-1140-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f62ef6cde7c5954a872586c0004f2737-hb21-1140-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1140vote5b948f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e07dfc677540a8e6872586cc006e405a-hb21-1140-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2724a583453f1a00872586da004dd046-hb21-1140-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1140vote5564f3

Bill Comments 750

feedback