CO HB1137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning practices of unit owners' associations, and, in connection therewith, authorizing the enforcement of certain matters regarding unit owners' associations in small claims court and limiting the conduct of unit owners' associations in collecting unpaid assessments, fees, and fines.
Title
Homeowners' Association Board Accountability And Transparency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1137 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1137 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1137 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1137 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2022-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-13 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |