CO HB1137 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning notification by legislative staff to members of the general assembly regarding rules adopted as a result of legislation.
Title
Limit Notification General Assembly Regarding Adoption Of Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1137 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1137 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1137 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1137 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-05 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |