CO HB1136 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-9)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning health insurance coverage for a prosthetic device necessary for a covered person to engage in certain types of activities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prosthetic Devices For Recreational Activity

Sponsors

Rep. Anthony Hartsook [R]Rep. David Ortiz [D]Sen. Larry Liston [R]Sen. Faith Winter [D]
Rep. Judith Amabile [D]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Andrew Boesenecker [D]
Rep. Brandi Bradley [R]Rep. Kyle Brown [D]Rep. Lindsey Daugherty [D]Rep. Ken Degraaf [R]
Rep. Ruby Dickson [D]Rep. Regina English [D]Rep. Lisa Frizell [R]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]
Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Eliza Hamrick [D]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]Rep. Junie Joseph [D]
Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]Rep. Sheila Lieder [D]Rep. Mandy Lindsay [D]Rep. William Lindstedt [D]
Rep. Meghan Lukens [D]Rep. Javier Mabrey [D]Rep. Bob Marshall [D]Rep. Matthew Martinez [D]
Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]Sen. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]
Rep. Jennifer Parenti [D]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Marc Snyder [D]
Rep. Tammy Story [D]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]Rep. Elizabeth Velasco [D]
Rep. Ron Weinberg [R]Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Jenny Willford [D]Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]
Rep. Mary Young [D]Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]
Sen. James Coleman [D]Sen. Lisa Cutter [D]Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]Sen. Thomas Exum [D]
Sen. Rhonda Fields [D]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Janice Marchman [D]
Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Kyle Mullica [D]Sen. Byron Pelton [R]Sen. Kevin Priola [D]
Sen. Dylan Roberts [D]Sen. Jim Smallwood [R]Sen. Tom Sullivan [D]Sen. Perry Will [R]
Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]

Roll Calls

2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1136 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1136 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1136, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1136, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-25 Governor Signed
2023-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2023-04-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2023-04-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-14HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-03-21HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2023-01-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb23-1136
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1136_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1136_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1136_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1136_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1136_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1136_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/1A6603532574EC4D87258978005CD4CA/HB1136_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/6383DE8DBEDC482A8725898F00544412/HB1136_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1136_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1136_l_002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1136_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1136_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1136_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1136_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/28e74253be868cb58725897900606d38-hb23-1136-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/84fbdc5da2122af787258991004e9954-hb23-1136-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/84fbdc5da2122af787258991004e9954-hb23-1136-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1136vote5681bf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/075ec6c9acbe98b78725899d008190f0-hb23-1136-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b639f6f82368c1698725899f00503379-hb23-1136-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1136vote5c5ba5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/28e74253be868cb58725897900606d38-hb23-1136-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback