CO HB1136 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning treatment for individuals with substance use disorders, and, in connection therewith, adding residential and inpatient treatment to the Colorado medical assistance program and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance Use Disorder Treatment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1136 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1136, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1136, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1136, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1136, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05 Governor Signed
2018-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-05-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2018-05-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/07/2018 - No Amendments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-04-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2018-04-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-19HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2018-04-19HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-03-13HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1136
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1136_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1136_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1136_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1136_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1136_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1136_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-03-13t134902z-hb18-1136-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-03-13t134902z-hb18-1136-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-19t073212z-hb18-1136-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-19t073212z-hb18-1136-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1136vote5d712e
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-25t133505z-hb18-1136-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-27t083155z-hb18-1136-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1136vote5ea69e
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1136vote635d70
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1136vote6383e5
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-25t133505z-hb18-1136-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback