CO HB1136 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Multiple Crew Members Required For Freight Trains
Title
Multiple Crew Members Required For Freight Trains
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1136 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1136 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1136 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |