CO HB1136 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parking Privileges Disabled Veteran License Plate
Title
Parking Privileges Disabled Veteran License Plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1136 to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1136 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1136 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1136 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1136 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1136 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1136 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-04-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2015-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |