CO HB1136 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Use Of Public Land For Retail Sales
Title
Prohibit Use Of Public Land For Retail Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 12-1136 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 12-1136 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 12-1136 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | |
2012-04-26 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2012-04-25 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-24 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-19 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-18 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Lay Over Amended | |
2012-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |