CO HB1135 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the extension of the advanced industries export acceleration program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Advanced Industry Export Acceleration Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1135 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1135 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1135, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1135 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29 Governor Signed
2018-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-04-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-04-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2018-04-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-19HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1135
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1135_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1135_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1135_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1135_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1135_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1135_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-02-08t133128z-hb18-1135-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-19t073212z-hb18-1135-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-19t073212z-hb18-1135-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1135vote5bae4e
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2018a2018-04-25t140443z-hb18-1135-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-26t090323z-hb18-1135-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1135vote5a3aaa

Bill Comments

feedback