CO HB1134 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning mandatory provisions in home warranty service contracts, and, in connection therewith, requiring a home warranty service contract to include terms allowing a homeowner to replace any of certain gas-fueled devices with a device that operates on electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require Electric Options In Home Warranties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.011) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 23-1134 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 23-1134, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-31 Governor Signed
2023-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2023-03-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-03-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-03-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2023-03-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2023-03-06SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2023-03-02SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2023 - No Amendments
2023-02-27SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2023-02-14HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-02-13HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2023-02-08HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb23-1134
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1134_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1134_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1134_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1134_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1134_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1134_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/AA142B9002AB1F358725894F0071BB29/HB1134_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/60481041BDAAA79C87258955006B262F/HB1134_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/79E1C59A4BCEEED68725896A0059FBE5/HB1134_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/E3B538DA39BEA2A28725896B00521F9C/HB1134_L.011.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1134_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1134_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1134_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/56388c1f627f583d8725895000651bf3-hb23-1134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1134vote5b8333
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/56388c1f627f583d8725895000651bf3-hb23-1134-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/30a42ed5fd05c5818725896300717561-hb23-1134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1134vote5a159d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1134vote5b6020
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1134vote6be7d5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1134vote6c2d05

Bill Comments

feedback