CO HB1132 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning county reimbursements for election supplies from the local elections assistance cash fund.
Title
County Reimbursement For Local Elections Supplies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1132 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1132 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1132 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1132 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-01-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-23 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |