CO HB1130 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Overseas Citizens Municipal Election Voting Access
Title
Overseas Citizens Municipal Election Voting Access
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Nordberg [R] | Rep. Su Ryden [D] | Sen. Leroy Garcia [D] | Sen. Owen Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a corrected conference committee report (Attachment A) under Joint Rule 4 (h) pertaining to correction of a mistake in the original conference committee report (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt the preamended bill (Attachment A), as amended, as the first report of the first conference committee on House Bill 15-1130 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment to page 6 of the preamended bill (Attachment A), strike line 20 and substitute "submit via postal mail the ballot and the completed signed affirmation, as specified" (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.028 (Attachment D) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1130 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt the preamended bill (Attachment A), as amended, as the first report of the first conference committee on House Bill 15-1130 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment to page 6 of the preamended bill (Attachment A), strike line 20 and substitute "submit via postal mail the ballot and the completed signed affirmation, as specified" (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.028 (Attachment D) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1130 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-05 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-05-04 | House | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2015-05-01 | House | First Conference Committee Result was to Corrected Report Amending Rerevised Bill |
2015-04-30 | House | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments |
2015-04-27 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2015-04-27 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Re-referred to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs - No Amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/06/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |