CO HB1129 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning extension of the deadline by which teachers must complete training in teaching reading.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Deadline For Training To Teach Reading

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1129 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1129 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10 Governor Signed
2021-04-30 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-30HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-20SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-15SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2021-03-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-23HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-03-22HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-02-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1129
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1129_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1129_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1129_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1129_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1129_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1129_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1129_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1129_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6f59673009bcaf548725869b005a1e43-hb21-1129-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1129vote540fa0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2d4ab5b69ca86e49872586b8006eb750-hb21-1129-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1129vote55fe7d

Bill Comments 750

feedback