CO HB1128 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Complaint Documents Discovery
Title
Protect Complaint Documents Discovery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 11-1128 indefinitely at the request of the sponsor (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 11-1128 indefinitely at the request of the sponsor (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 11-1128 indefinitely at the request of the sponsor (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1128 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1128 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1128 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 11-1128 indefinitely at the request of the sponsor (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 11-1128 indefinitely at the request of the sponsor (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1128 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1128 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1128 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-02-08 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-07 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-01 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |