CO HB1125 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-7)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-7)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the modernization of the process to change groundwater well owner contact information.
Title
Modernize Process To Obtain Water Well Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1125 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1125 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1125 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1125 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Governor Signed | |
2023-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2023-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-02-13 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |