CO HB1123 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/11/2017 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/11/2017 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of a local government to extend the hours during which alcohol beverages may be sold for consumption on a licensed premises.
Title
Extend On-premises Retail Alcohol Beverages Sales Hours
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1123 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1123 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1123 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/11/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/21/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/13/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/07/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/31/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/24/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2017-02-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |