CO HB1122 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning establishing a commission to improve first responder interactions with persons with disabilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

First Responder Interactions Persons With Disabilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1122 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1122, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1122, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1122, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1122, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1122, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1122, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-21SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-05-14SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-05-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-12SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-11SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-07SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2021-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-15HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-04-13HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1122
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1122_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1122_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1122_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1122_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1122_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1122_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1122_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1122_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1122_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1122_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1122_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1122_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1122_L.013.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1122_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1122_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1122_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1122_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1784788cd84ccf36872586a1007086e0-hb21-1122-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1784788cd84ccf36872586a1007086e0-hb21-1122-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1784788cd84ccf36872586a1007086e0-hb21-1122-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1784788cd84ccf36872586a1007086e0-hb21-1122-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1784788cd84ccf36872586a1007086e0-hb21-1122-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/feac6af212b2ebd5872586b6004d7c25-hb21-1122-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/feac6af212b2ebd5872586b6004d7c25-hb21-1122-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1122vote6fea45
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/176bcf7dbd4fbcfd872586c3006fd397-hb21-1122-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7384cb58ae1563f2872586ce004f525f-hb21-1122-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1122vote55a47a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1122vote5604b3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1122vote561f09
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/176bcf7dbd4fbcfd872586c3006fd397-hb21-1122-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback