CO HB1122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a maternal mortality review committee in the department of public health and environment, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Department Of Public Health And Environment Maternal Mortality Review Committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1122 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1122 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1122, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1122, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1122, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Governor Signed
2019-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-22SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-13HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1122
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1122_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1122_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1122_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1122_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1122_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2a1907c431d90e9e872583a0005cc0e7-hb19-1122-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2a1907c431d90e9e872583a0005cc0e7-hb19-1122-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6276274ab948a820872583da004b1f4a-hb19-1122-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6276274ab948a820872583da004b1f4a-hb19-1122-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1122vote59ebaf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2a31db537c777c40872583e50013f0f4-hb19-1122-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6a5334c60ada06dd872583e6004b5281-hb19-1122-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1122vote566b28

Bill Comments

feedback