CO HB1122 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a maternal mortality review committee in the department of public health and environment, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Colorado Department Of Public Health And Environment Maternal Mortality Review Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1122 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1122 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1122, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1122, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1122, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1122 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1122 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1122, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1122, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1122, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-13 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |