CO HB1122 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the issuance of a new birth certificate with a gender designation that differs from the gender designated on the person's original birth certificate.
Title
Gender Identification On Birth Certificates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1122 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1122 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1122 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1122 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1122 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |