CO HB1121 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning supporting local media.
Title
Supporting Local Media
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Cutter [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003, as amended by L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003, as amended by L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1121, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-10 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |