CO HB1119 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the authority of the state government to regulate perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government Regulation Of Perfluoroalkyl And Polyfluoroalkyl Substances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1119 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1119 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1119, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1119, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1119, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1119, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1119, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Governor Signed
2020-06-22 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-08SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-05-28HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-03-09HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1119
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1119_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1119_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1119_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1119_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1119_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1119_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/665dd876d8c715dc872585260074ecb6-hb20-1119-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/665dd876d8c715dc872585260074ecb6-hb20-1119-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/665dd876d8c715dc872585260074ecb6-hb20-1119-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/665dd876d8c715dc872585260074ecb6-hb20-1119-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/665dd876d8c715dc872585260074ecb6-hb20-1119-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/086b2f6c30f842d087258576006bc0c9-hb20-1119-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/157417cdb43cb5058725857c00617fc3-hb20-1119-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/157417cdb43cb5058725857c00617fc3-hb20-1119-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1119vote6731bc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f41fcb67e083e8778725858200161e26-hb20-1119-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b16874cb4835e1a872585820069678c-hb20-1119-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1119vote543e62

Bill Comments

feedback