CO HB1118 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the time allowed for a tenant to cure a lease violation that is not a substantial violation.
Title
Time Period To Cure Lease Violation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1118 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1118 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.020) (Y: 31 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.021) (Y: 30 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.027) (Y: 26 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment J) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1118 to the Committee on Transportation & Local Government. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1118 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1118 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.020) (Y: 31 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.021) (Y: 30 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.027) (Y: 26 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment J) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1118 to the Committee on Transportation & Local Government. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-18 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-17 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2019-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-13 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Transportation & Local Government |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |