CO HB1118 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the statewide health care review committee to study health care issues that affect Colorado residents throughout the state, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Create Health Care Legislative Review Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1118 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1118 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1118, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1118 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1118, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |