CO HB1117 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the definitions applicable to the misbranding of food, and, in connection therewith, prohibiting failing to label food from animals not born, raised, and harvested exclusively in the United States as imported; prohibiting labeling food that does not come from animals as "meat" or terms that describe meat; and requiring laboratory-grown meat labeling to display notice of its origin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Misbranding Nonmeat And Imported And Artificial Meat

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
2020-02-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Subjects


Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback