CO HB1115 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the prescription drug monitoring program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment N). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment M). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment L). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment N). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment M). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment L). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |