CO HB1113 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 05/30/2015 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 05/30/2015 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure Sale Continuation HOA Assessments
Title
Foreclosure Sale Continuation HOA Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 05/30/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-24 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/26/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |