CO HB1112 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enlargement of certain income tax credits for low- and middle-income working individuals or families, and, in connection therewith, reducing state income tax revenue by increasing the earned income tax credit and restructuring the child tax credit to allow all low-income taxpayers with income below certain thresholds to claim the credit.
Title
Earned Income And Child Tax Credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.011) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1112, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1112, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1112 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.011) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1112, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1112, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1112 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2023-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |