CO HB1111 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning harmonization of the unauthorized insurance premium tax rate with the surplus lines insurance premium tax rate.
Title
Unauthorized Insurance Premium Tax Rate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1111 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1111 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1111 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1111 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Governor Signed | |
2023-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2023-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-09 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |