CO HB1111 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-7)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-7)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning insurance coverage for insured losses incurred as a result of a declared fire disaster, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Insurance Coverage For Loss Declared Fire Disaster
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1111 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1111, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002, as amended by L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1111 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1111, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002, as amended by L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-04-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2022-03-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |