CO HB1109 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the broadband deployment board, and, in connection therewith, moving the board from the department of regulatory agencies to the office of information technology, modifying the composition of the board, requiring the board to develop a request for proposal process for deploying broadband into critically unserved areas in the state, requiring the board to give additional consideration to proposed projects that would include discounted service for low-income households, and making an appropriation.
Title
Broadband Board Changes To Expand Broadband Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Reconsider House Bill 21-1109. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Reconsider Amendment L.012. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.015. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.014. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.013. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.012. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt Amendment L.011. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1109 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G). (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Reconsider House Bill 21-1109. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Reconsider Amendment L.012. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.015. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.014. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.013. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.012. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt Amendment L.011. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1109 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G). (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1109, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2021-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government + Finance |