CO HB1108 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to expand the ability of nonresident electors to participate in the governance of special districts, and, in connection therewith, allowing nonresident electors who own taxable property within the special district to vote in special district elections and allowing such electors to serve on special district boards in a nonvoting capacity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonresident Electors And Special Districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 19-1108 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 19-1108 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1108, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-02-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-15HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/14/2019 - No Amendments
2019-02-08HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/11/2019 - No Amendments
2019-02-05HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-31HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1108
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1108_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1108_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1108_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/950d41a0d1355254872583930071039c-hb19-1108-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/950d41a0d1355254872583930071039c-hb19-1108-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1108vote602b80
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0e044a31c3f41f67872583b50070e51e-hb19-1108-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0e044a31c3f41f67872583b50070e51e-hb19-1108-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback