CO HB1107 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Senate Committee on Transportation Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Senate Committee on Transportation Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that builders of new residences offer buyers the option to accommodate electric vehicle charging systems.
Title
Prewire Residence For Electric Vehicle Charging Port
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Page 2, line 6, strike "shall" and substitute "may". (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Postpone House Bill 18-1107 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Postpone House Bill 18-1107 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1107 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Postpone House Bill 18-1107 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Postpone House Bill 18-1107 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1107 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |