CO HB1106 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recover Actual Damages Personal Injury
Title
Recover Actual Damages Personal Injury
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1106 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1106 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1106 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1106 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1106 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-03-25 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government | |
2011-03-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-17 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-09 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |