CO HB1102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requirements of pet stores that sell certain pet animals.
Title
Consumer Protection For Dog And Cat Purchasers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 25 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 25 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-01 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-16 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-12 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2021-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |