CO HB1102 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gifted Education Programs
Title
Gifted Education Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment XX?) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment X) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment X) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment XX?) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment X) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment X) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1102, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Re-referred to Appropriations - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2014-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-10 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |