CO HB1102 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Portability Child Care Background Checks
Title
Portability Child Care Background Checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1102 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1102 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1102 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1102 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1102 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-03 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-02-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-02 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-01 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-01-27 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |