CO HB1098 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the expanded ability of the Colorado oil and gas conservation commission to finance the remediation of oil and gas locations.
Title
Roll Over Year-end Balance Envtl Response Account
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Saine [R] | Rep. Matt Gray [D] | Sen. Vicki Marble [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1098 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1098 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1098 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1098 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1098 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1098 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2018-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-08 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/09/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-01 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/28/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-07 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance |