CO HB1097 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-8)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-8)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recommendations from the Colorado behavioral health task force, and, in connection therewith, establishing a behavioral health administration.
Title
Establish Behavioral Health Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1097 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1097 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1097 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1097 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - No Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |