CO HB1097 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

PUC Permit For Medicaid Transportation Providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUC Permit For Medicaid Transportation Providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1097 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1097 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1097 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1097 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1097 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1097 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-20HouseGovernor Signed
2016-05-13HouseSent to the Governor
2016-05-13HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-05-12HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-05-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-04-28SenateSenate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-04-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
2016-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-18HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 04/19/2016 - No Amendments
2016-04-15HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-01-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6955C9460EE22EB087257F240064FC02?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6955C9460EE22EB087257F240064FC02/$FILE/1097_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6955C9460EE22EB087257F240064FC02/$FILE/1097app_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6955C9460EE22EB087257F240064FC02/$FILE/1097_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6955C9460EE22EB087257F240064FC02/$FILE/1097_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6955C9460EE22EB087257F240064FC02/$FILE/1097_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6955C9460EE22EB087257F240064FC02/$FILE/1097_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6955C9460EE22EB087257F240064FC02/$FILE/1097_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6955C9460EE22EB087257F240064FC02/$FILE/1097_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/58687A70D80F67A987257F4F006270F8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/58687A70D80F67A987257F4F006270F8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FE1529D52EF6533C87257F96004B6F07
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D380D6DD901B75CC87257F96004B76C1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/88142DAE7F9AE30087257F9A0055702E/$FILE/Ap19.pdf#918
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C735B23C5A6EC5E287257FA3006493D3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C735B23C5A6EC5E287257FA3006493D3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/26B6ABC335292B3887257FA8004EF2B4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/7B7188F934C5A95287257FA9004CB394/$FILE/jour_113.pdf#1040
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D380D6DD901B75CC87257F96004B76C1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FE1529D52EF6533C87257F96004B6F07
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/26B6ABC335292B3887257FA8004EF2B4

Bill Comments

feedback