CO HB1093 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning county authority to license and regulate short-term lodging rentals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Authority License And Regulate Business

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2020-02-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-11HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-05HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback