CO HB1092 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - House Vote to Override Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - House Vote to Override Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the eligibility of a candidate for lieutenant governor to be a candidate for another elected office.
Title
Candidate Lieutenant Governor Eligible For Other Office
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Williams [R] | Sen. Chris Holbert [R] | Rep. Chris Kennedy [D] | Rep. Andres Pico [R] |
Rep. Shane Sandridge [R] | Rep. Donald Valdez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: VETO Bill (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1092 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1092 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1092, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | House | House Vote to Override Lost |
2021-05-07 | Governor Vetoed | |
2021-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |